ABRAHAM'S OASIS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abraham's Oasis UK raises awareness among the British public through concerts, speaking engagements, one on one contacts to provide a means to send contributions towards the activities of Abraham's Oasis in Ethiopia. Projects supported are for vulnerable children and at risk mothers who are given given total care and training for sustainable outcomes within Ethiopia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 01 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian David Kerr | Chair | 16 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Joanna Catherine Edwards | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas John William Edwards | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Katrina Anne Kerr | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rosemary Burke | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
RUTH KENNEDY | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN SMALL | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Dr PHILLIP RICE | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.69k | £27.06k | £16.34k | £16.47k | £14.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £22.34k | £88 | £38.25k | £12.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF ORPHANS, VULNERABLE WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN NEED IN ETHIOPIA, AND THOSE CHILDREN AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS IN THE NORTH WEST ZONE OF TIGRAY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) WORKING WITH ABRAHAM'S OASIS, SHIRE, ENDASEIASSIE, TIGRAY, ETHIOPIA AND COLLABORATING WITH THE INTERNATIONAL PARTNERS OF ABRAHAM'S OASIS, IN PROMOTING PROGRAMMES FOR THE PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF ORPHANS, VULNERABLE WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN TIGRAY, ETHIOPIA. (B) RAISING AWARENESS IN THE UK OF THE SUBJECT OF ORPHANS, VULNERABLE WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN NEED IN ETHIOPIA AND THOSE CHILDREN AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS IN THE NORTH WEST ZONE OF TIGRAY, ETHIOPIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Vespasian Gardens
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG24 9SH
- Phone:
- 07775770395
- Email:
- ukabrahamsoasis@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window