DYNAMIC YOUTH THEATRE

Charity number: 1177421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Dynamic Youth Theatre aims to provide affordable opportunities for young people aged 6-18 (regardless of their background and any physical or mental disabilities) to develop their skills, confidence and appreciation of performing arts through acting, singing and dancing in theatre shows.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £12,545
Total expenditure: £11,035

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Southampton City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JASON GERRARD SLY Chair 05 March 2018
None on record
Caitlin Buckley Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Joseph Samuel Wright Trustee 02 July 2021
None on record
RACHAEL ANN THORPE Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record
ANITA JAYNE PRITCHARD Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record
WENDY KATHRYN SOUTH Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record
STEVE EVERETT Trustee 05 March 2018
EASTLEIGH YOUTH & COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Karen Everett Trustee 05 March 2018
THE HOUSE OF ST BARNABAS
GATSBY AFRICA
Received: On time
LONDON NARROW BOAT PROJECT
Received: On time
ASSOCIATION OF CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS
Received: On time
EMALENE ADELE HICKMAN Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.21k £20 £8.88k £11.43k £12.55k
Total expenditure £3.64k £389 £7.80k £9.03k £11.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 23 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 08 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Wyre Close
Chandler's Ford
Eastleigh
SO53 4QR
Phone:
07810444518