LASTING LIFE THE SIMON MACCORKINDALE LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lasting Life's mission is to improve the quality of life for those dealing with cancer; to help them and their families, provide help in finding or funding, alternative ways to deal with problems faced and meeting their specific needs. This will primarily be achieved through the giving of grants to individuals and / or organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN GEORGE | Chair | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Pope | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Reid | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Rutherford Makepeace | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Brian Francis Aris | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN TAYLOR | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.06k | £33.44k | £34.58k | £46.90k | £21.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.84k | £42.24k | £34.45k | £43.77k | £14.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 December 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 02 December 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 January 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 January 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 December 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 21 December 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: · THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN THE FIELD OF CANCER RELATED HEALTHCARE AND MEDICAL WELFARE. · THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED OF HELP IN THEIR FIGHT AGAINST CANCER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Higher Eastcott Farm
Withiel Florey
Taunton
Taunton
Somerset
TA24 7DG
- Phone:
- 01398371187
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window