Financial history NATIONAL CYCLE MUSEUM

Charity number: 511257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.07k £4.14k £16.81k £18.16k £31.60k
Total expenditure £17.57k £8.00k £19.02k £19.90k £26.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A