Trustees THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Charity number: 511314
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Philip Palmer Anderson | Chair | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Christopher Wardale | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dennis Peter Parker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Edward Roman Tulasiewicz | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Matthew Alexander Pentti Sinclair | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Mary Walford | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Joanna Pullan | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||
George William Heslop | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|||||
LAWRENCE MCLEMAN | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Margaret Oliver Stewart | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|||||
THE REVD CANON ROBERT IAN MCTEER | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.