Financial history SINGLETON SPACES

Charity Number: 1180577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £239.27k £221.48k £322.78k £335.11k £417.34k
Total expenditure £255.01k £209.64k £288.44k £353.70k £410.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.40k £122.98k £38.07k £13.00k £1.00k