SPEAR SEARCH AND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saving lives through emergency response and capacity building in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2018: CIO registration
- SPEAR SAR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Read | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Parry | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.22k | £178 | £4.01k | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.39k | £69 | £3.65k | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT LIFE IN THE EVENT OF DISASTERS, HAZARDS, CRISES AND EMERGENCIES ON AFFECTED POPULATIONS AND/OR INDIVIDUALS WITHIN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY, IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE A DEDICATED AND TRAINED VOLUNTEER EMERGENCY SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICE TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT THE EMERGENCY SERVICES AND OTHER AGENCIES IN THE OPERATION OF SEARCH AND RESCUE AND BY PROVIDING MEDICAL AND HUMANITARIAN AID IN SUCH CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EQUIPMENT TO LOCAL COMMUNITIES TO INCREASE THEIR CAPACITY AND CAPABILITY TO REACT AND PROVIDE ASSISTANCE IN THE IMMEDIATE AFTERMATH OF SUCH DISASTERS, CRISES AND EMERGENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Compass Centre
Nelson Road
London Heathrow Airport
HOUNSLOW
TW6 2GW
- Phone:
- 07972517888
- Email:
- hq@spear-sar.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window