Financial history AGORA TRUST

Charity number: 1176722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £158.67k £152.73k £246.70k £321.91k £38.98k
Total expenditure £263.26k £211.04k £244.51k £114.79k £151.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A