FRIENDS OF THE DROP-IN FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to improve the mental health and well-being of all asylum seekers and refugees in Sunderland, whilst promoting their integration into the wider community. Our weekly Drop-in now extends to a Women?s group and added activities for all ages. Our intention is to develop these undertakings. FODI continues the work of the charity of the same name (registered charity 1153057). ?2011-2018.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,124 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sunderland
Governance
- 04 January 2018: CIO registration
- 24 September 2018: Funds received from 1153057 FRIENDS OF THE DROP-IN FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFU...
- FODI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN NEWMAN | Chair | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roismi Rajakumar | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mahnur Roushan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Melika Azhandeh | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Talha Mahmood | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Reardon | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABRAHAM EHIAGHE EILUORIOR | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE NIKOLARAKIS | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.40k | £86.25k | £91.22k | £178.67k | £127.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.50k | £61.45k | £92.60k | £133.07k | £146.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.49k | N/A | N/A | £47.13k | £7.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM/ GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, THROUGH PROVIDING A DROP-IN AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES. 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 3. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FODI
The Co-Op Centre
Whitehouse Road
Hendon
Sunderland
- Phone:
- 07548756382
- Email:
- info@fodisunderland.org
- Website:
-
fodisunderland.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window