CHURCHWARD COUNTY TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Churchward County Trust Ltd continues to actively raise awareness of its goal to re-create a Great Western Railway 'County' class 4-4-0 steam locomotive using a mixture of new and original components. We continue to promote membership of the charity and raise funds to achieve our charitable aims through membership, sales and appeals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 May 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BRADSHAW | Chair | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Davies | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Townson | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CROUCHER | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.17k | £72.58k | £95.28k | £68.76k | £63.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.60k | £3.07k | £3.06k | £8.37k | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 APR 2019 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN RAILWAY HISTORY AND ENGINEERING LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) THE CONSTRUCTION, DISPLAY, OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY LENDING OUT TO HERITAGE RAILWAYS, A FULL-SIZE, WORKING EXAMPLE OF A GREAT WESTERN RAILWAY ‘COUNTY’ CLASS 4-4-0 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE. (II) THE ACQUISITION, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, DISPLAY, OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY LENDING OUT, HERITAGE RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, TENDERS, COACHES, WAGONS AND ALL MANNER OF RAILWAY ARTEFACTS FOR USE ON OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE AFOREMENTIONED ‘COUNTY’ CLASS 4-4-0 LOCOMOTIVE. (III) PROVIDING ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND CERTIFICATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE PRACTICALITIES, TECHNIQUES AND METHODS OF HERITAGE RAILWAY ENGINEERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Green End Barns
Ramsey Road
ST. IVES
Cambridgeshire
PE27 5RH
- Phone:
- 0744 5689475
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window