DEVON AGRICULTURAL & RURAL TRAINING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education & training in rural skills and such other matters of educational value as the Trustees determine, particularly in Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 18 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Josephine Broom | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jayne Stanbury | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annemarie Broomfield | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FRANK BERRY | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RICHARD CLEAVE | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Purser | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.44k | £6.57k | £6.81k | £6.94k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £775 | £1.99k | £2.83k | £4.72k | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN RURAL SKILLS AND SUCH OTHER MATTERS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE, PARTICULARLY IN DEVON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VENN FARM
BRIDFORD
EXETER
EX6 7LF
- Phone:
- 0164724120
- Email:
- skills@devonyfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window