EDEYRNION HERITAGE AND CULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates for the benefit of the public, a permanent museum, exhibition and information centre. The charity holds and/or owns collections of artefacts and specimens, protecting them for, and making them accessible to, the public, now and in the future. The charity holds exhibitions on the heritage, culture and biodiversity of Edeyrnion and the Dee Valley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 13 November 2018: Standard registration
- AMGUEDDFA CORWEN (Working name)
- CORWEN MUSEUM (Working name)
- CYMDEITHAS TREFTADAETH A DIWYLLIANOL EDEYRNION (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Hughes | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Wyn Davies | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jones Hughes | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Robert Haigh | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Marian Wyn Thomas | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
GORDON KEITH PARKER | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ROBERT PAICE | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev HEATHER FENTON | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HARVEY WYETH | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr NORMAN RONSON JONES | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ANNETTE DALE | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.71k | £13.90k | £4.58k | £14.02k | £5.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.78k | £4.86k | £5.58k | £13.67k | £38 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
A.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A PERMANENT MUSEUM, EXHIBITION AND INFORMATION CENTRE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND BIODIVERSITY OF EDEYRNION AND THE DEE VALLEY. B.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ACQUIRING AND HOLDING, HOUSING AND EXHIBITING, DOCUMENTING CONSERVING RESTORING AND REPAIRING OBJECTS AND COLLECTIONS OF AN EDUCATIONAL NATURE AND MAKING THEM ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC NOW AND IN THE FUTURE.
Area of benefit
EDEYRNION AND THE DEE VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Corwen Museum
London Road
Corwen
Denbighshire
LL21 0DP
- Phone:
- 07548 983068
- Email:
- office@corwenmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window