Financial history NATIONAL BLACK, ASIAN, MIXED RACE AND MINORITY ETHNIC TRANSPLANT ALLIANCE (NBTA).

Charity Number: 1177538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.04k £2.06k £25.30k £2.00k £3.70k
Total expenditure £16.91k £1.50k £1.01k £1.76k £6.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.89k N/A £23.15k N/A N/A