Accounts and annual returns MERRYFIELDS SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 511636
Charity reporting is overdue by 1789 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1789 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1789 days