MERRYFIELDS SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various fundraising activities ranging from car boot sales, summer fayres, charity auction, sponsored walks, Christmas Fayre etc. Expenditure is the cost of reward trips for the children, theatre company visits and other activities that are not curriculum related.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 August 1981: Standard registration
- 02 June 2023: Funds received from 701338 THE NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE HOSPITALS CHILDRENS TRUST
- MERRYFIELDS P T F A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Rowles | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | £6.31k | £11.52k | £2.94k | £4.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.82k | £5.20k | £3.27k | £8.91k | £700 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1056 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1056 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1421 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1421 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1786 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1786 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE ABOVE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FUNDS TO PURCHASE SPECIAL EQUIPMENT NOT NOMALLY PROVIDED BY THE EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
STAFFORDSHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL
MERRYFIELDS SCHOOL
HOON AVENUE
NEWCASTLE
ST5 9NY
- Phone:
- 01782296076
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window