THE WOODHAMS STONE COLLECTION

Charity Number: 1177312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Currently working on cataloguing the collections of some 8000 objects and paper ephemera providing a tangible social history of Malton, Norton and the local area for the education of the general public. In 2022 we expanded our shop window Heritage Trail around the shops and buildings in the two towns in order to further inform the general public about the history of the area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,915
Total expenditure: £15,419

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2018: CIO registration
  • 28 June 2019: Funds received from 1155394 THE WOODHAMS-STONE COLLECTION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JILL ELIZABETH WILSON Chair 26 March 2017
None on record
Dr PETER RICHARD WILSON Trustee 21 September 2021
THE VINDOLANDA TRUST
Received: On time
MALTON MUSEUM CIO
Received: On time
SENHOUSE MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
John Howard Blanchard Trustee 03 November 2020
None on record
Thomas Howard Campion Trustee 03 November 2020
None on record
Sarah Katherine Maultby Trustee 03 November 2020
None on record
Nicholas John Hatton Trustee 07 February 2019
None on record
DINAH ELIZABETH KEAL Trustee 01 June 2011
RYEDALE COMMUNITY AND LEISURE CENTRE
Received: On time
FREDERICK ABBOTT FOR THE PLEASURE GROUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
DERWENT RIVERSIDE PROJECT
Received: On time
THE RYEDALE COMMUNITY FOODBANK
Received: On time
NEXT STEPS MENTAL HEALTH RESOURCE CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.36k £26.89k £27.85k £6.36k £1.92k
Total expenditure £13.50k £12.35k £13.38k £7.35k £15.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £535 £550 £4.67k £5.50k £500

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 August 2024 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 October 2024 246 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 February 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 February 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 March 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 March 2021 48 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Buckrose Court
Commercial Street
Norton
MALTON
North Yorkshire
YO17 9HN
Phone:
01653696006