Financial history GROWING YOUNG DISCIPLES

Charity number: 1178450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £147.86k £63.71k £246.97k £297.35k £340.91k
Total expenditure £118.80k £75.84k £184.72k £318.51k £382.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A