CHURCHES AND INDUSTRY GROUP BIRMINGHAM-SOLIHULL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Churches and Industry Group Birmingham is an ecumenical charity providing workplace chaplains to care for people at work in Birmingham and Solihull and acts with other denominations and faiths to promote a more humane and just society, affirming work as part of God's creative purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
Governance
- 12 November 1986: Standard registration
- 24 October 2024: Funds received from 1126145 WORKCARE COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE LIMITED
- CHURCHES AND INDUSTRY GROUP BIRMINGHAM (Previous name)
- CHURCHES' INDUSTRIAL GROUP BIRMINGHAM (CIGB) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Mountford | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mary Catherine Smith | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev DAVID EMANUEL ELLIS | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev David Michael Butterworth | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID ARTHUR PINWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICK JOHN BRYAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.73k | £58.34k | £61.81k | £42.69k | £59.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.45k | £65.61k | £46.66k | £26.66k | £20.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED ON 18 JUNE 1987, 17 MARCH 1994, 14 MAY 1998 AND 06 JANUARY 2011 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2017 as amended on 11 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY AIMS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY 2.1.1 MINISTERING TO INDIVIDUALS IN WORKPLACES AND BODIES ENGAGED IN ECONOMIC AND TRAINING ISSUES; 2.1.2 ENCOURAGING THE CHURCHES’ ENGAGEMENT WITH WORKING LIFE AND ECONOMIC CONCERNS; 2.1.3 FACILITATING CHAPLAINCY AND PASTORAL CARE IN WORKPLACES AND TRAINING ESTABLISHMENTS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICS OR RELIGION; 2.1.4 PROVIDING AND SHARING INFORMATION AND TRAINING ON SOCIO-ECONOMIC AND FAITH MATTERS 2.1.5 SUPPORTING TRAINING SCHEMES 2.1.6 WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH CHURCHES, BUSINESSES, UNIONS, PUBLIC SECTOR BODIES AND SIMILAR ASSOCIATIONS. 2.2 THE CHARITY AIMS TO ADVANCE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND CITIZENSHIP THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY 2.2.1 WORKING ECUMENICALLY AMONGST DIFFERENT CHURCHES AND DIFFERENT FAITHS; 2.2.2 ENCOURAGING REASONABLE AND LAWFUL PERSONAL EXPRESSION OF ALL FAITHS AND SPIRITUALITIES IN WORKPLACES; SUCH AS BY ADVISING ON THE PROVISION OF FAITH SPACES AND FACILITATING DIVERSITY AND INTERFAITH ENGAGEMENT; CONSTITUTION OF CHURCHES AND INDUSTRY GROUP BIRMINGHAM-SOLIHULL PAGE | 2 2.2.3 SUPPORTING COMMUNITY REGENERATION INITIATIVES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, GENDER, OR POLITICAL OPINION. 2.3 THE CHARITY WILL OPERATE PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND THE BOROUGH OF SOLIHULL.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND BOROUGH OF SOLIHULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Churches and Industry Group
Citadel
190 Corporation Street
Birmingham
B4 9QD
- Phone:
- 01214260425
- Email:
- val.dalton@cigb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window