OPEN HOUSE BEDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open House promotes the health and well-being of people with Learning Disabilities residing permanently or temporarily in Bedford Borough, by the provision of day centre facilities for learning, social engagement and recreational activities. Open House meets once a week on Wednesdays in St Marks Church Community Centre, Bedford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £2,687 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
Governance
- 05 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MORAG ANN STEWART | Chair | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev JENNIFER MARGARET CAPPLEMAN | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|||||
LAURA FARTHING | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|||||
LYNNE SEYMOUR | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.99k | £327 | £200 | £11.27k | £8.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.08k | £556 | £1.12k | £4.80k | £7.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN BEDFORD BOROUGH, BY THE PROVISION OF DAY CENTRE FACILITIES FOR LEARNING, SOCIAL ENGAGEMENT AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARKS CHURCH & COMMUNITY CENTRE
CALDER RISE
BEDFORD
MK41 7UY
- Phone:
- 01234342613
- Email:
- office@openhouse.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window