Financial history GWENT YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS

Charity number: 1178227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £40.86k £50.76k £44.39k £71.12k £65.21k
Total expenditure £38.35k £30.00k £65.48k £69.03k £64.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.69k N/A £4.06k £4.13k