Financial history FRIENDS OF BAILEY HILL / FFRINDIAU BRYN Y BEILI

Charity number: 1179312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.50k £677 £11.57k £1.07k £767
Total expenditure £1.70k £894 £4.93k £4.72k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £160 N/A £5.67k £300 N/A