Bible Encounter Trust Charitable Incorporated Organisation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES VISITS TO LOCAL SCHOOLS,CHURCHES AND OTHER PLACES TAKING ASSEMBLIES,LESSONS OR OTHER TALKS AS REQUESTED PROVIDING BENEFIT FOR THE WHOLE COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Stockport
- Trafford
Governance
- 06 September 2018: CIO registration
- 13 April 2022: Funds received from 1077447 BIBLE ENCOUNTER TRUST
- BIBLE ENCOUNTER (Working name)
- BIBLE ENCOUNTER TRUST (Working name)
- BIBLE ENCOUNTER CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- BIBLE ENCOUNTER TRUST CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Leslie Webster | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sarah Kathryn Burrows | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Webster | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARK DAVID PAUL TOMLINSON | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GRAHAM LOWCOCK | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|||||
PHILIP GEORGE HENRY WELLS | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £21.66k | £45.23k | £55.24k | £37.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £14.00k | £14.08k | £37.31k | £43.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 June 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 June 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2018 as amended on 28 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 MOSELEY GRANGE
CHEADLE HULME
CHEADLE
SK8 5EZ
- Phone:
- 0161 485 6957
- Email:
- bibleencounter@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window