THE SAM WEST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Sam West Foundation is to promote awareness, diagnosis and treatment of mental health issues affecting children, young adults and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHRIS WEST | Chair | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dineli Charlesworth | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Michelle West | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ISABELLE MARYAM IRANI | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.20k | £44.75k | £41.12k | £61.95k | £33.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.61k | £36.73k | £45.95k | £63.17k | £49.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY PROMOTING AWARENESS, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WITH A TRACK RECORD OF WORKING IN THESE AREAS. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN MUSIC AND ARTS BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WITH A TRACK RECORD OF WORKING IN THESE AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TWO TEMPLE PLACE
2 TEMPLE PLACE
LONDON
WC2R 3BD
- Phone:
- 02071935800
- Email:
- cwest@samwestfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window