Fylingdales Museum & Archive Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collection and curation of historic artefacts relating to the parish of Fylingdales. Yorkshire and the maintenance of a museum open to the public to display and interpret a selection of such artefacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 April 2018: CIO registration
- 07 April 2021: Funds received from 510254 FYLINGDALES MUSEUM AND LIBRARY TRUST
- Fylingdales Museum & Archive Trust (Working name)
- ROBIN HOOD'S BAY MUSEUM (Working name)
- FYLINGDALES MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Thomas | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gregory Pennock | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Haigh J.P. | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Staniforth | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
J. MORTIMER | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.52k | £796 | £5.92k | £50.09k | £22.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £1.21k | £2.44k | £8.18k | £36.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Apr 2018 as amended on 02 Apr 2024 as amended on 14 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the public by the provision of a Museum to collect preserve and exhibit items of historical, industrial and ecological interest with particular emphasis on items relating to the locality of Robin Hood’s Bay and Fylingdales and to maintain an archive of documents, books, maps, photographs and other forms of written and printed word to enable these to be accessed by the public for study and other purposes.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Royd
Station Road
Robin Hoods Bay
WHITBY
North Yorkshire
YO22 4RL
- Phone:
- 01947880260
- Email:
- museum@rhbay.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window