Financial history CARE FOR CLARE APPEAL

Charity number: 1179011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £1.06k £4.43k £7.95k £17.68k
Total expenditure £0 £2.34k £3.96k £216 £22.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A