THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH LONGLEVENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 April 2018: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY LONGLEVENS PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH LONGLEVENS (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RACHEL ELEANOR FORREST | Chair | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JULIE LATCHEM-HASTINGS | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ALICIA KINSVILLE | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN HARDY | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Elizabeth Mason | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WATSON | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DENNIS LEATHERDALE | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MAY MACKNESS B.A. HONS | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TERRY HAINES | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JANET PERHAM CHITTY | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MARGARET ROBINSON | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN MICHAEL PEACHEY | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL REES | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY LOUISE HUMPHRIS | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.86k | £59.53k | £71.53k | £88.33k | £97.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.55k | £62.04k | £63.20k | £85.35k | £87.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY HUB
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH HALL
CHURCH ROAD
LONGLEVENS
GLOUCESTER
GL2 0AJ
- Phone:
- 01452307871
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window