TICKHILL & DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1178985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Tickhill & District Lions Club (CIO) operate in the area covering Tickhill, Rossington, Wadworth, Bawtry, Harworth, Bircotes and Styrrup and provide grants throughout that district to organisations such as Community Groups, Sports Clubs, Local Hospitals and Schools, Scouts and Guides, Food Banks, Air Ambulance, other National and International Charities and generally for people in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £97,686
Total expenditure: £62,433

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LIONS CLUB OF TICKHILL & DISTRICT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Byrne Chair 09 March 2021
None on record
Steven Hattersley Trustee 10 May 2024
None on record
Robert Day Trustee 27 February 2024
None on record
Julia Clough Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Robert Ian Uney Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Penelope Jane Bradley Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
STUART ALLEN Trustee 09 March 2021
TICKHILL COUNTRYSIDE GROUP
Received: On time
RONALD HARRY LINDSAY M.Sc. Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £67.48k £18.53k £69.28k £86.75k £97.69k
Total expenditure £28.52k £17.73k £61.06k £89.14k £62.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.40k £1.40k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 12 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 01 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Bungalow
Coxley Close
Sheep Bridge Lane
Rossington
Doncaster
DN11 0EZ
Phone:
07818416825