TEWKESBURY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Worship & Outreach for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAYNE Elizabeth WEBB | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Julie Claire May | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Wendy Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET SHELLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER TOLMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
IRIS CAROL BROWN | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE WOOLFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN BEARDSLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
HILARY WOOLFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MICHAEL SHELLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA June TURNER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DOBBS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDA SALLIS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
JEAN ELIZABETH DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
ROGER LESLIE DOBBS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN STYCH | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.14k | £83.59k | £64.80k | £69.17k | £241.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.44k | £89.52k | £83.75k | £90.28k | £90.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 July 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 November 2020 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 ASHCHURCH ROAD
TEWKESBURY
GL20 8BX
- Phone:
- 01684298650
- Email:
- charitygroupTMC@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window