AUTHORS' AWARDS AND ADVANCEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Literary Awards and Prizes for the celebration and advancement of authors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW SUBRAMANIAM | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Owen David Atkinson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Zoey Louise Forbes | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
The Society of Authors | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Olex | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | £376.50k | £109.44k | £464.68k | £64.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £10.50k | £18.32k | £67.83k | £184.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO PROMOTE THE ART OF LITERATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 1 THE ESTABLISHMENT, SUPPORT, MAINTENANCE AND AWARD OF PRIZES; 2 THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING, COACHING AND MENTORING TO NEW AUTHORS, UNPUBLISHED AUTHORS, LITERARY EXECUTORS AND BENEFICIARIES AND BY ENGAGING IN OR SUPPORTING RELEVANT RESEARCH AND ENSURING THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC; AND 3 THE RELIEF OF AUTHORS SUFFERING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 3.1, “AUTHORS” MEANS CREATORS OF ALL FORMS OF WORKS INCLUDING LITERARY, DRAMATIC, ARTISTIC, SCIENTIFIC, TECHNICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND MUSICAL WORKS, ADAPTATIONS OR PUBLICATIONS IN WHATEVER FORMAT OR MEDIA OR MULTIMEDIA INCLUDING FILMS, BROADCASTS, PERFORMANCE AND RECORDINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Society of Authors
24 Bedford Row
LONDON
WC1R 4EH
- Phone:
- 02038802230
- Email:
- info@societyofauthors.org.uk
- Website:
-
www2.societyofauthors.org.uk/prizes
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window