West Preston Methodist Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church and Community Centre on three sites offering various services to the local community across the west of Preston adult education, social cafe, thrift shop, sporting facilities, support and outreach groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

26 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 June 2018: Standard registration
- ASHTON METHODIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennie Lockett | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Ferneyhough | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lowe | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Akin Adewale | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dcn Rebekah - Joy Spinks | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shahbaz Simon | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Clark | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
RUTH BALL | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Grimsley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Horrocks | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Elizabeth Ainsworth | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|||||
David Lowes | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Gill Mason | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Warnock | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Jan Rainford | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harry Duckett | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gregory | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Martin | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gregory | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hackett | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Joanne Ainsworth | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Gregson | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pam Eaton | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Taylor | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY GREGSON | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE GREGSON | Trustee | 01 September 1978 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.15k | £463.58k | £77.92k | £116.53k | £111.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.01k | £131.51k | £147.48k | £203.11k | £153.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2020 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2020 | 163 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932 as amended on 09 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Preston Methodist Church
Wellington Road
Ashton-On-Ribble
PRESTON
PR2 1BU
- Phone:
- 01772723579
- Email:
- minister@wpmc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window