BODMIN LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1178036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bodmin Lions Club supports the local community in Bodmin, Cornwall raising funds through fundraising for Local, National and Lions International causes. Fundraising events include: Weekly Bingo Nights, Bodmin Ten Tors walk, Christmas Fair, Christmas Sleigh and Horse Fun ride etc. We also support Bodmin St Piran's Day Parade, Bodmin Firework Night and other events in the town.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £13,165
Total expenditure: £9,378

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LIONS CLUB OF BODMIN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Frank Line Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
DAVID ROBERT TRURAN Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record
KEVIN BURNARD MARSHALL Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record
DANIEL BRINSON Trustee 05 March 2018
CORNWALL'S REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
Received: On time
RONALD ALLAN GOODGAME Trustee 05 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £19.26k £4.87k £12.09k £16.82k £13.17k
Total expenditure £14.73k £4.09k £8.34k £12.82k £9.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 28 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 QUEENS CRESCENT
BODMIN
PL31 1QP
Phone:
0120873001