Financial history THE STEVENSON AND JULIAN CHARITY

Charity number: 512123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/06/2020 13/06/2021 13/06/2022 13/06/2023 13/06/2024
Total gross income £180 £181 £186 £712 £344
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £450
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A