TEETH TEAM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teeth Team is a school based programme targeting children aged 0-11 providing supervised tooth brushing, fluoride varnish and an education programme targeting areas of high deprivation in Hull and others areas around the UK. Teeth Team aims to help children establish a good oral health regime, whilst delivering a programme of dental assessment and signposting to primary and secondary care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER GROOMBRIDGE | Chair | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Adamson | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
CHRIS AYER | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID WARD | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
EMMA IDESON | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
RUTH MARGARET MURRAY | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.44k | £47.64k | £32.96k | £56.93k | £43.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.37k | £27.25k | £14.61k | £40.56k | £72.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 January 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 13 January 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 23 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JAN 2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF DENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ELIMINATE ORAL HEALTH INEQUALITY AND TOOTH DECAY, IN PARTICULAR AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY (A) THE PROVISION OF ORAL HEALTH CARE AND EDUCATION TO THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR TO CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, PARENTS AND TEACHERS; (B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES, RAISING AWARENESS AND ADVOCATING THE IMPORTANCE OF GOOD ORAL HEALTHCARE AND ORAL HYGIENE TO OVERALL HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
543 Dental Centre Ltd
543-549 Anlaby Road
HULL
HU3 6HP
- Phone:
- 01482565488
- Email:
- chris@teethteam.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window