Accounts and annual returns CLYBIAU FFERMWYR IFANC YNYS MÔN (ANGLESEY YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS)

Charity number: 1180236
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 February 2025 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 February 2025 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2025 386 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 February 2025 386 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window