THE HERITAGE ELECTRIC TRAINS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration of heritage trains powered by electricity for display and operation at public heritage railways sites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2019: CIO registration
- 30 July 2021: Funds received from 1135280 ELECTRIC RAILWAY MUSEUM LIMITED
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAEME STEPHEN GLEAVES | Chair | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK STEVEN WALLING | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN ARTHUR BROWN CBE | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|||||
NEIL IVOR BENNETT | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.31k | £9.74k | £11.24k | £9.65k | £23.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £5.76k | £8.64k | £8.72k | £21.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF SUSTAINABLE RAIL TRANSPORT THROUGH THE MEANS OF PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND PUBLIC DISPLAY OF HISTORIC ROLLING STOCK AND OTHER ITEMS OF RAILWAY INTEREST RELATING TO THE STORY OF THE DEVELOPMENT OF ELECTRICALLY PROPELLED RAILWAYS. ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS INCLUDE: • THE PUBLICATION, DISTRIBUTION AND DISPLAY OF MATERIALS FOR PUBLIC EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE STORY AND SCIENCE OF ELECTRIC RAILWAYS AND THEIR CONTRIBUTION TO THE ENVIRONMENT. • TO ASSIST OTHER ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE SIMILAR AIMS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAVINIA LODGE
36 STRAYFIELD ROAD
ENFIELD
EN2 9JF
- Phone:
- 07956458453
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window