WALES LEADERSHIP FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities has been providing training, support and mentoring for christian leaders. This has included seminars, and an annual conference.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS STREET | Chair | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Peter Glyn Baker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
PHILIP DAVIES | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev ANDREW MARK PITT | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev John-Edward Funnell | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Lindsay Brown | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
David Norbury | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.78k | £35.67k | £64.18k | £77.22k | £77.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.26k | £18.89k | £41.50k | £59.96k | £59.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WILL BE PROMOTED BY: SHARING AND IMPLEMENTING THE BEST STRATEGIES FOR REACHING OTHERS FOR CHRIST; RENEWING LOCAL CHURCHES. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY WILL BE ACHIEVED BY ORGANISING CONFERENCES AND PROGRAMMES TO ASSIST CHRISTIAN LEADERS WITH: DEVELOPING THEIR GIFTS AND ABILITIES IN THEIR UNIQUE VOCATIONS AND CALLINGS; MENTORING THE NEXT GENERATION OF EVANGELICAL LEADERS; FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THEIR MINISTRIES; LEADING THEIR CHURCHES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS FAITHFULLY AND WITH GODLY WISDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 SOUTH RISE
CARDIFF
CF14 0RG
- Phone:
- 07925408650
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window