THE LONGUEVILLE TRUST

Charity number: 512338
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The funds may be applied for any charitable purposes within the County of Herefordshire, but the Trustees will give special consideration for the relief of sick and convalescent persons in Herefordshire and to charitable purposes in the Eardisley & Kington districts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £170
Total expenditure: £2,436

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 March 1982: Standard registration
  • 13 September 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 13 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1167802 THE CART SHED CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LONGVILLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.30k £1.19k £1.19k £745 £170
Total expenditure £318 £1.68k £1.68k £1.23k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required