ST MARY'S CHURCH HOUSE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a Community (& Church) Hall for meetings/lectures/classes and other forms of recreation/leisure activity with the aim of improving the condition of life for inhabitants of Bridport without distinction of political/religious or other opinions. A supervised volunteer committee manages the halls' letting/cleaning/insurance/services/repairs and maintenance on a non-profit making basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Anthony O'Farrell | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Anthony Meadley | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monty Frederick Crook | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN BARTLETT | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Dommett | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.73k | £32.89k | £14.29k | £16.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.08k | £15.12k | £17.06k | £18.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.90k | £8.66k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A FACILITY FOR THE PURPOSES OF: 3.1 A COMMUNITY HALL FOR USE OF INHABITANTS OF BRIDPORT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3.2 A CHURCH HALL FOR USE BY OFFICERS, STAFF AND USERS OF ST MARY’S CHURCH ON A BASIS AGREED BETWEEN THE CHARITY TRUSTEES AND THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Thread Mill Lane
Pymore
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 5QT
- Phone:
- 01308 456138
- Email:
- sbartlett7416@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window