Financial history WOMEN'S PRIZE TRUST

Charity Number: 1181253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £467.78k £555.89k £559.15k £652.01k £846.47k
Total expenditure £291.27k £575.24k £702.07k £618.08k £914.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £150.81k £118.09k £186.52k £171.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £5.88k £55.95k £3.33k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £405.08k £435.18k £0 £670.77k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £409.37k £965
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £434.67k £599.66k £617.98k £902.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £140.57k £102.41k £93 £12.04k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £23.55k £30.47k £60.17k £2.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0