THE CLIFTON HANDBELL RINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study and practice of handbell ringing in order to foster the public knowledge and appreciation of such music by means of public performances
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Calderdale
Governance
- 11 March 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Michael Holroyd | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|||||
KAREN ELIZABETH KENT | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID SUNDERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN KENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH KENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID RALSTON BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.23k | £1.07k | £367 | £1.52k | £1.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £755 | £760 | £1.66k | £1.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 1982.
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF HANDBELL RINGING IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PULBIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
34-36 Fall Lane
Hartshead
Liversedge
WF15 8AR
- Phone:
- 01274877080
- Email:
- admin@chbr.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window