DAWATAL ISLAM SOOTHILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of worship for members of the public. Out of hours Islamic education for children. Islamic marriage ceremony's. Funeral services. Educational talks (Both Islamic/health/general well being) Outreach activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 06 August 2018: CIO registration
- DAWATAL ISLAM MOSQUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suleman Aswat | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Shiraz Valimulla | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Aswat | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Dawood | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Akbar Dabharia | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ayaz Ayub Vardalia | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADAM RAVAT | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BASHIR KHALIFA | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABDULHAY DOKRAT | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ZAID UMARJI | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.26k | £184.29k | £180.60k | £233.80k | £275.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.74k | £215.72k | £218.22k | £238.75k | £274.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 10 October 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 10 October 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE SOOTHILL AREA OF BATLEY WEST YORKSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE ÆAREA OF BENEFITÆ) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A MASJID (PLACE OF WORSHIP) AND MADRESSAH (PLACE OF LEARNING), TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY ALL MEANS CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY QURAN AND AHAADITH AS INTERPRETED BY THE SUNNI HANAFI DEOBANDI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT AND FOR THE PROVISION OF ISLAMIC FUNERAL SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dawatal Islam Mosque
West Acre Drive
Soothill
BATLEY
WF17 6PE
- Phone:
- 01924424786
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window