MATAN ESTHER LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making donations to UK registered charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 January 2019: Standard registration
- MATAN ESTHER (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ESTHER HOFFMAN | Chair | 11 May 2018 |
|
|||||
IAN FEINER | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY FELD | Trustee | 03 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deena Schwartz | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mordechay Hoffman | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.00k | £36.00k | £38.00k | £87.25k | £125.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.02k | £41.33k | £22.38k | £87.31k | £115.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE DIRECTORS SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 MIDDLETON ROAD
LONDON
NW11 7NS
- Phone:
- 02084556359
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window