THE WEM SPORTS AND SOCIAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for sporting bodies of Wem
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 16 January 2019: CIO registration
- 21 January 2022: Funds received from 522583 THE WEM SPORTS AND SOCIAL ASSOCIATION
- WSSA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Gwillam | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bennett | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wanda Ollerenshaw | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Griffiths | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Drummond | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MANDY MEAKIN | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|||||
EDWARD TOWERS | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.85k | £97.04k | £95.91k | £33.83k | £41.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £698.34k | £84.39k | £106.83k | £43.28k | £46.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.00k | £18.43k | £8.16k | £13.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE AND SUPPORT FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SPORTS CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO COOPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CIO IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WSSA
Wem Library
High Street
Wem
SHREWSBURY
SY4 5AA
- Phone:
- 01939232733
- Email:
- info@wem.gov.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window