GOD IS GIVING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
God Is Giving brings financial inclusion to financially and socially disadvantaged people, regardless of their religious beliefs. Our free services include money workshops, access to banking, budget building and morally responsible Christian lending via an interest free grant scheme. Working closely with churches, food banks & community front line professionals operating through home visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- GIG (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £695 | £1.11k | £1.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £672 | £465 | £842 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2019 as amended on 16 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1.THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE AND EDUCATION IN RELATION TO, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, MONEY MANAGEMENT AND BUDGETING ADVICE; AND B) PROVIDING GRANTS, INTEREST FREE LENDING, ITEMS, SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IF AND IN SO FAR AS SUCH PURPOSE SHALL BE CHARITABLE. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND DOCTRINE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window