Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NEWTON HARCOURT

Charity number: 512460
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 November 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required