Financial history Borth Community Hub

Charity number: 1179468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £101.49k £137.97k £139.36k £204.67k £184.49k
Total expenditure £92.11k £93.23k £154.23k £145.33k £176.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £6.50k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.65k £13.74k £35.25k £23.62k £8.50k