Trustees Borth Community Hub
Charity number: 1179468

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND PAUL QUANT | Chair | 06 August 2018 |
|
|||||
SUSAN JANE DALTON | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Esther Bat-Isha | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jaqueline King Bainbridge | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JOY COOK | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HAYNES | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
RONA THOMPSON DALTON | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.