ANTHEM. MUSIC FUND WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance in life young people in Wales, aged from 3 to 25, by supporting them to reach their potential through musical opportunities and activities in all genres. We seek to identify and nurture musical talent and ability, and to support career pathways in music and the music industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 February 2019: Standard registration
- ANTHEM. CRONFA GERDD CYMRU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emyr Afan Davies | Chair | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosey Morwenna Brown | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Lewis | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Monica Roe | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dafydd Herbert-Pritchard | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Evans | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Smith | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwenda Mary Carnie | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Radcliffe | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Alexander Collier | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Ella May Pearson | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan James Singh | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tayla-Leigh Payne | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ifunanychukwu Susan Leatrice Iwobi | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Hughes Roberts | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £856 | £4.63k | £126.30k | £153.75k | £203.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.90k | £78.80k | £163.84k | £390.58k | £309.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 FEB 2019 as amended on 05 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE YOUNG PEOPLE IN LIFE AND TO HELP THEM TO ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL THROUGH MUSIC BY: (1)SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE IN WALES AGED FROM 3 TO 25 TO REACH THEIR POTENTIAL THROUGH MUSICAL OPPORTUNITIES AND ACTIVITIES; (2)MAKING ACCESSIBLE MUSICAL OPPORTUNITY ACROSS WALES TO ALL YOUNG PEOPLE AGED FROM 3 TO 25; (3)DEVELOPING MUSICAL OPPORTUNITY IN ALL GENRES AND IN ALL COMMUNITIES; (4)IDENTIFYING AND NURTURING TALENT AND ABILITY; AND (5)SUPPORTING CAREER PATHWAYS IN MUSIC AND THE MUSIC INDUSTRY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
202 Trafalgar House
5 Fitzalan Place
Cardiff
CF24 0ED
- Phone:
- 07966450299
- Email:
- post@anthem.wales
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window