WELLS CATHEDRAL CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Choir strives to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of choral music in all its aspects, particularly by providing music for sung services in Wells Cathedral and in parish churches in the Diocese of Bath & Wells, and with occasional charity concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2018: Standard registration
- WELLS CATHEDRAL VOLUNTARY CHOIR (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Louise Reyes BSc Hons | Chair | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Walker | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Margaret Walker | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eve Mary Miller | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arnold Wills | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Julia Frances Dallosso BMus Hons | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.15k | £4.17k | £7.14k | £8.96k | £10.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.66k | £3.74k | £6.79k | £8.22k | £10.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 AUG 2008 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 15 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHOIR SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF LITURGICAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING MUSIC FOR THE SUNG SERVICES IN WELLS CATHEDRAL AND IN PARISH CHURCHES IN THE DIOCESE OF BATH & WELLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shetland
Compton Street
Compton Dundon
SOMERTON
Somerset
TA11 6PS
- Phone:
- 01458446487
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window