THE MIRANDA BRAWN DIVERSITY LEADERSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Miranda Brawn Diversity Leadership Foundation is a Charity focused on education, building self-confidence, career development and networking opportunities to uncover diverse talent from all social backgrounds with the potential for leadership success in the workplace. We design and deliver innovative educational, diversity leadership programmes and skills-building workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MIRANDA BRAWN | Chair | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tendai Wileman | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DARREN ALLAWAY | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.25k | £14.79k | £12.61k | £21.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.19k | £6.32k | £8.20k | £36.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A. PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, WORK EXPERIENCE AND MENTORING PROGRAMMES WHICH ARE DIRECTED TO DEVELOPING SKILLS CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND SO THAT THEY CAN COMPETE IN THE JOB MARKET ON EQUAL TERMS. B. DELIVERING TALKS AND LECTURES TO SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES TO RAISE AWARENESS AMONG STUDENTS ABOUT OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCCESS IN THEIR STUDIES AND FUTURE CAREERS. 2. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; B. CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 81
95
MORTIMER STREET
LONDON
W1W 7GB
- Phone:
- 07806708636
- Email:
- info@tmbdlf.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window